IA SF177 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Subcommittee, Danielson, Chapman, and Dvorsky. S.J. 283.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act concerning lottery games and revenue for support of veterans. (Formerly SSB 1012; see SF 323.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act concerning lottery games and revenue for support of veterans. (Formerly SSB 1012; see SF 323.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2015-02-11SenateSubcommittee, Danielson, Chapman, and Dvorsky. S.J. 283.
2015-02-10SenateFiscal note. SCS.
2015-02-09SenateReferred to Appropriations. S.J. 249.
2015-02-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 247.
2015-02-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 246.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback