IA SF177 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned, Petersen, Boettger, and Dvorsky. S.J. 95.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to domestic abuse protective orders and pets or companion animals owned or held by a petitioner, respondent, or minor child of the petitioner or respondent in a domestic abuse case. (See SF 2118.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to domestic abuse protective orders and pets or companion animals owned or held by a petitioner, respondent, or minor child of the petitioner or respondent in a domestic abuse case. (See SF 2118.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2014-01-22SenateSubcommittee reassigned, Petersen, Boettger, and Dvorsky. S.J. 95.
2013-12-31SenateEND OF 2013 ACTIONS
2013-02-21SenateSubcommittee, Petersen, Dvorsky, and Sorenson. S.J. 314.
2013-02-13SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 256.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback