IA SF177 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-10 - Subcommittee reassigned, Baudler, Kressig, and Tjepkes. H.J. 54.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the director of the Iowa law enforcement academy and the membership of the Iowa law enforcement academy council and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 15.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the director of the Iowa law enforcement academy and the membership of the Iowa law enforcement academy council and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 15.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-01-10 Subcommittee reassigned, Baudler, Kressig, and Tjepkes. H.J. 54.
2011-12-31 END OF 2011 ACTIONS
2011-05-05 Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1160.
2011-03-30 Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 856.
2011-03-29 Committee amendment H-1487 filed. H.J. 840.
2011-03-18 Subcommittee, Tjepkes, Baudler, and Kressig. H.J. 721.
2011-03-09 Read first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 585.
2011-03-08 Message from Senate. H.J. 562.
2011-03-08 Immediate message. S.J. 533.
2011-03-08 Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays none. S.J. 530.
2011-03-08 Amendment S-3043 adopted. S.J. 529.
2011-03-07 Amendment S-3043 filed. S.J. 523.
2011-02-08 Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 253.
2011-02-08 Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 250.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback