IA SF171 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on July 2 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-07-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1132.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the state percent of growth and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1140.) Effective 7-2-15.
Title
A bill for an act establishing the state percent of growth and including effective date and retroactive applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1140.) Effective 7-2-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-05 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 36 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-05 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 44 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 26 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1132. |
2015-06-05 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1131. |
2015-06-05 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1131. |
2015-06-05 | House | Message from House. S.J. 1116. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Immediate message. H.J. 1172. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Passed House, ayes 53, nays 36. H.J. 1171. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Rule 75, duty of voting, invoked. H.J. 1170. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Conference committee report adopted. H.J. 1170. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Conference committee report filed. H.J. 1166. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Message from Senate. H.J. 1168. |
2015-06-05 | House | Immediate message. S.J. 1115. |
2015-06-05 | House | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 5. S.J. 1113. |
2015-06-05 | House | Conference committee report filed and adopted. S.J. 1113. |
2015-06-05 | House | Fiscal note, as amended by the CCR. SCS. |
2015-03-02 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 431. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 392. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Senate conference committee appointed, Quirmbach, Bowman, Gronstal, Dix, and Sinclair. S.J. 392. |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 391. |
2015-02-25 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 413. |
2015-02-25 | House | House conference committee appointed Soderberg, Paulsen, Upmeyer, Ruff, and Steckman. H.J. 412. |
2015-02-25 | House | House insisted. H.J. 412. |
2015-02-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 407. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 366. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Senate refused to concur with S-3014. S.J. 366. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3014. S.J. 349. |
2015-02-24 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 396. |
2015-02-24 | House | Passed House, ayes 55, nays 44. H.J. 393. |
2015-02-24 | House | Committee amendment H-1009 adopted. H.J. 392. |
2015-02-23 | House | Fiscal note. HCS. |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee amendment H-1009 filed. H.J. 358. |
2015-02-18 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 357. |
2015-02-17 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-02-11 | House | Subcommittee, Jorgensen, Dolecheck, and Ruff. H.J. 307. |
2015-02-11 | House | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 304. |
2015-02-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 303. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 262. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 257. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3003, ruled out of order. S.J. 257. |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Amendment S-3003 filed. S.J. 257. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 242. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 240. |