IA SF167 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Schneider. S.J. 95.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-22 - Subcommittee reassigned, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Schneider. S.J. 95.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act creating the penalty of death for the commission of murder in the first degree, kidnapping, and sexual abuse against the same minor, providing a penalty, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act creating the penalty of death for the commission of murder in the first degree, kidnapping, and sexual abuse against the same minor, providing a penalty, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Schneider. S.J. 95. |
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee, Hogg, Dvorsky, and Sorenson. S.J. 261. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 235. |