IA SF166 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on February 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 249.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the state school foundation program, by modifying requirements for the enactment of the state percents of growth, establishing state percents of growth, modifying provisions relating to school district property tax replacement payments, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1028.) Effective 2-8-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the state school foundation program, by modifying requirements for the enactment of the state percents of growth, establishing state percents of growth, modifying provisions relating to school district property tax replacement payments, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1028.) Effective 2-8-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 249. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 248. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 248. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 227. |
2017-02-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 234. |
2017-02-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 55, nays 40. H.J. 234. |
2017-02-06 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 233. |
2017-02-06 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 233. |
2017-02-06 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 233. |
2017-02-06 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 233. |
2017-02-06 | House | Speaker ruled point well taken. H.J. 233. |
2017-02-06 | House | Point of order raised Rule 10, decorum in debate. H.J. 233. |
2017-02-06 | House | Substituted for HF 136. H.J. 233. |
2017-02-06 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 194. |
2017-02-06 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 191. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 211. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 226. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 21. S.J. 211. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3017 filed, lost. S.J. 210. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3016 filed, lost. S.J. 210. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3012, ruled out of order. S.J. 209. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3012 filed. S.J. 209. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3011 filed, lost. S.J. 209. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3015 filed, lost. S.J. 208. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3014 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 208. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3013, ruled out of order. S.J. 207. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Amendment S-3013 filed. S.J. 207. |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 173. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 172. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB55 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Passed subcommittee.
SSB1028 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF136 (Similar To) 2017-02-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 234.
SSB1028 (Related) 2017-01-30 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF136 (Similar To) 2017-02-06 - Withdrawn. H.J. 234.