IA SF166 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the categorical state percent of growth for purposes of the state school foundation program and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1076.)
Title
A bill for an act establishing the categorical state percent of growth for purposes of the state school foundation program and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1076.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-02-18 | Read first time, referred to Education. H.J. 370. | |
2011-02-17 | Message from Senate. H.J. 358. | |
2011-02-16 | Immediate message. S.J. 315. | |
2011-02-16 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 24. S.J. 314. | |
2011-02-14 | Fiscal note. SCS. | |
2011-02-07 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 236. | |
2011-02-07 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 232. |