IA SF149 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-07 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to civil actions associated with permissible physical contact between certain specified school employees or volunteers and students, including civil and criminal immunity, monetary damages, and attorney fees.(Formerly SSB 1005.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to civil actions associated with permissible physical contact between certain specified school employees or volunteers and students, including civil and criminal immunity, monetary damages, and attorney fees.(Formerly SSB 1005.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-07 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2024-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2024 12:30PM Senate Lounge. |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Subcommittee: Garrett, Petersen, and J. Taylor. S.J. 119. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 1091. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 199. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 192. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1005 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 149.