IA SF148 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-08 - Withdrawn. S.J. 288.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to noneconomic damage awards against health care providers, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1063.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to noneconomic damage awards against health care providers, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(Formerly SSB 1063.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3021 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3020 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3019 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3018 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3017 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3016 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3019 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3018 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3021 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3020 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3019 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3018 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3017 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3016 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3020 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 17 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3019 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3018 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3017 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3016 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2023-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3019 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3018 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3021 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3020 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3019 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3018 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3017 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3016 to amendment S–3015 be adopted? (Y: 16 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-08 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 288. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | HF 161 substituted. S.J. 287. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Attached to HF 161. S.J. 287. |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 344. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amendments S-3004, S-3005, S-3006, and S-3014 out of order. S.J. 287. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3015 adopted. S.J. 286. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3017 filed, lost. S.J. 286. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3018 filed, lost. S.J. 285. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3020 filed, lost. S.J. 284. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3021 filed, lost. S.J. 283. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3019 filed, lost. S.J. 283. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3016 filed, lost. S.J. 282. |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Amendment S-3015 filed. S.J. 282. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Amendment S-3014 filed. S.J. 279. |
2023-02-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3006 filed. S.J. 241. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Amendments S-3004 and S-3005 filed. S.J. 209. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 199. |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 192. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1063 (Related) 2023-01-26 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 148.