IA SF140 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. [].
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to rental agreements and early termination rights of tenants who are victims of certain crimes.
Title
A bill for an act relating to rental agreements and early termination rights of tenants who are victims of certain crimes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-15 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. []. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2023 1:00PM Room G15. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Subcommittee: Bousselot, Knox, and Rowley. S.J. 208. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 184. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB2 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 547.
HF547 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Subcommittee: Webster, De Witt, and Quirmbach. S.J. 679.
HF547 (Similar To) 2023-03-22 - Subcommittee: Webster, De Witt, and Quirmbach. S.J. 679.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF140 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF140.html |