IA SF135 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 27 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-12 - Fiscal note.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to registered interior design and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 27.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to registered interior design and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 27.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-03 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-08 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-01-25 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-12SenateFiscal note.
2023-04-27SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 998.
2023-04-26SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 986.
2023-04-04SenateMessage from House. S.J. 731.
2023-04-03HouseImmediate message. H.J. 756.
2023-04-03HousePassed House, yeas 95, nays 0. H.J. 754.
2023-03-21HousePlaced on calendar. H.J. 707.
2023-03-21HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 707.
2023-03-14HouseSubcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0.
2023-03-13HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 03/14/2023 12:45PM House Lounge.
2023-03-08HouseSubcommittee: Golding, Siegrist and Steckman. H.J. 561.
2023-02-09HouseRead first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 284.
2023-02-09HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 280.
2023-02-08SenateImmediate message. S.J. 288.
2023-02-15SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 344.
2023-02-08SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 281.
2023-02-07SenateFiscal note.
2023-01-25SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 188.
2023-01-25SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 183.

Same As/Similar To

SF27 (Similar To) 2023-01-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 135. S.J. 188.

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=SF135
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/SF135.html
Texthttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGE/90/attachments/SF135.html
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1367939.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/FN/1373754.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230125_SJNL.pdf#188
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230208_SJNL.pdf#281
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20230403_HJNL.pdf#754
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20230208_SJNL.pdf#280
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#188
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#280
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/1445225.pdf#281

Bill Comments

feedback