IA SF135 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 931.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 931.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to campaign finance by requiring electronic filing of certain statements and reports and by raising the minimum dollar amounts that trigger certain regulations. (Formerly SSB 1063.) Effective 7-1-15.
Title
A bill for an act relating to campaign finance by requiring electronic filing of certain statements and reports and by raising the minimum dollar amounts that trigger certain regulations. (Formerly SSB 1063.) Effective 7-1-15.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 45 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 931. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 906. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 906. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 790. |
2015-04-07 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 786. |
2015-04-14 | House | Explanations of votes. H.J. 841. |
2015-04-07 | House | Passed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 770. |
2015-03-25 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 708. |
2015-03-18 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2015-03-12 | House | Subcommittee, Sexton, Highfill, and T. Taylor. H.J. 578. |
2015-03-11 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 546. |
2015-03-10 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 535. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 530. |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 45, nays 5. S.J. 528. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 211. |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 203. |