IA SF134 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Giddens, and Schultz. S.J. 728.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Giddens, and Schultz. S.J. 728.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for persons serving as public members on the Iowa board of veterinary medicine.
Title
A bill for an act providing for persons serving as public members on the Iowa board of veterinary medicine.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Giddens, and Schultz. S.J. 728. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Whiting, Lykam, and Schultz. S.J. 343. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Subcommittee: Whiting, Danielson, and Schultz. S.J. 208. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 182. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF134 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF134.html |