IA SF130 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to raccoon hunting. (Formerly SF 80.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to raccoon hunting. (Formerly SF 80.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 796. | |
2011-03-23 | Deferred, retained on calendar. H.J. 789. | |
2011-03-23 | SF 464 substituted. H.J. 781. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1435 as amended, adopted. H.J. 780. | |
2011-03-23 | Motion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 780. | |
2011-03-23 | Motion to suspend rules to consider H-1435, as amended. H.J. 780. | |
2011-03-23 | Ruled not germane H-1435, as amended. H.J. 780. | |
2011-03-23 | Point of order raised H-1435, as amended, not germane. H.J. 780. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1450 filed, lost. H.J. 780. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1436 adopted. H.J. 780. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1436 filed. H.J. 779. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1448 filed, lost. H.J. 779. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1447 filed, lost. H.J. 779. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1446 filed, lost. H.J. 779. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1445 filed, lost. H.J. 779. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1444 filed, lost. H.J. 779. | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment H-1443 filed, lost. H.J. 779. | |
2011-03-22 | Amendment H-1435 filed. H.J. 774. | |
2011-03-21 | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 741. | |
2011-03-02 | Subcommittee, Rayhons, Thede, and Van Engelenhoven. H.J. 499. | |
2011-02-23 | Read first time, referred to Natural Resources. H.J. 413. | |
2011-02-23 | Message from Senate. H.J. 410. | |
2011-02-23 | Immediate message. S.J. 380. | |
2011-02-23 | Passed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 379. | |
2011-02-02 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 203. | |
2011-02-02 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 203. |