IA SF13 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Independent 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act striking certain statutory repeal provisions relating to the state sales and use tax and the secure an advanced vision for education fund.
Title
A bill for an act striking certain statutory repeal provisions relating to the state sales and use tax and the secure an advanced vision for education fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-01 | Senate | NOBA: Graybook |
2017-01-30 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2017-01-30 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2017-01-26 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2017-01-25 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Feenstra, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 105. |
2017-01-12 | Senate | Subcommittee: Edler, Feenstra, and Quirmbach. S.J. 83. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 55. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF13 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF13.html |