IA SF125 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-24 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 931.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to alcoholic beverage control and matters under the purview of the alcoholic beverages division of the department of commerce. (Formerly SSB 1033.) Effective 7-1-15.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to alcoholic beverage control and matters under the purview of the alcoholic beverages division of the department of commerce. (Formerly SSB 1033.) Effective 7-1-15.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-07 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-04-24SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 931.
2015-04-21SenateSent to Governor. S.J. 906.
2015-04-21SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 906.
2015-04-07SenateMessage from House. S.J. 790.
2015-04-07HouseImmediate message. H.J. 786.
2015-04-14HouseExplanations of votes. H.J. 841.
2015-04-07HousePassed House, ayes 97, nays none. H.J. 760.
2015-04-07HouseSubstituted for HF 437. H.J. 760.
2015-03-26HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 717.
2015-03-26HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 710.
2015-03-25SenateImmediate message. S.J. 711.
2015-03-25SenatePassed Senate, ayes 50, nays none. S.J. 706.
2015-03-25SenateAmendment S-3061 adopted. S.J. 706.
2015-03-19SenateAmendment S-3061 filed. S.J. 667.
2015-02-02SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 195.
2015-02-02SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 190.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback