IA SF12 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, and Goodwin. S.J. 273.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-08 - Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, and Goodwin. S.J. 273.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to approval procedures for claims for the military service property tax exemption and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to approval procedures for claims for the military service property tax exemption and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Veterans Affairs Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Dotzler, and Goodwin. S.J. 273. |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 201. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Committee report, recommending passage. S.J. 178. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/19/2021 1:00PM RM 24A. |
2021-01-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Lofgren, Costello, and Dotzler. S.J. 96. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Veterans Affairs. S.J. 22. |