IA SF114 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-28 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to unintentionally causing the death of a person by operating a motor vehicle at an excessive speed, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1011.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to unintentionally causing the death of a person by operating a motor vehicle at an excessive speed, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable. (Formerly SSB 1011.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Kressig and Paustian. H.J. 125. |
2019-04-27 | House | Rereferred to Public Safety. H.J. 1076. |
2019-04-03 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 717. |
2019-04-03 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 715. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 837. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 44, nays 1. S.J. 836. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 833. |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3052, ruled not germane. S.J. 833. |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Amendment S-3052 filed. S.J. 676. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 177. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 171. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1011 (Related) 2019-01-16 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB157 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 366.
HF567 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1076.
HSB157 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 366.
HF567 (Similar To) 2019-04-27 - Referred to Public Safety. H.J. 1076.