IA SF113 | 2009-2010 | 83rd General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-07 - * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * *
Summary
A bill for an act relating to orders for postsecondary education subsidies. (Formerly SF 22.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to orders for postsecondary education subsidies. (Formerly SF 22.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-07 | * * * * * END OF 2009 ACTIONS * * * * * | |
2009-02-24 | Subcommittee, Smith, Kaufmann, and Willems. H.J. 569. | |
2009-02-19 | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 469. | |
2009-02-19 | Message from Senate. H.J. 465. | |
2009-02-19 | Immediate message. S.J. 359. | |
2009-02-19 | Explanation of vote. S.J. 369. | |
2009-02-19 | Passed Senate, ayes 41, nays 7. S.J. 357. | |
2009-02-19 | Amendment S-3020 lost. S.J. 357. | |
2009-02-10 | Amendment S-3020 filed. S.J. 276. | |
2009-02-05 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 242. | |
2009-02-05 | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 240. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://coolice.legis.state.ia.us/Cool-ICE/default.asp?Category=BillInfo&Service=DspHistory&var=SF&key=0132B&ga=83 |