IA SF112 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for certifications of trust and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1003.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for certifications of trust and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1003.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-09 - House - Passed House (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-23 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1075. |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1045. |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 910. |
2019-04-09 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 794. |
2019-04-09 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 795. |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed House, yeas 99 nays none. H.J. 791. |
2019-04-09 | House | Substituted for HF 324. H.J. 790. |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 620. |
2019-03-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 616. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 702. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 699. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 176. |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 170. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1003 (Related) 2019-01-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB25 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 232.
HF324 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 795.
HSB25 (Related) 2019-02-06 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 232.
HF324 (Similar To) 2019-04-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 795.