IA SF111 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Subcommittee reassigned, Taylor, Schneider, and Sodders. S.J. 82.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-16 - Subcommittee reassigned, Taylor, Schneider, and Sodders. S.J. 82.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the sale, operation, and possession of speed detection jamming devices, and making penalties applicable.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the sale, operation, and possession of speed detection jamming devices, and making penalties applicable.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned, Taylor, Schneider, and Sodders. S.J. 82. |
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Subcommittee, Taylor, Sodders, and Zaun. S.J. 199. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 177. |