IA SF105 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-10 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act establishing the criminal offense of sexual exploitation of a student with a disability by an employee of a community college and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act establishing the criminal offense of sexual exploitation of a student with a disability by an employee of a community college and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/10/2021 10:30AM RM 24A. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee: J. Taylor, Johnson, and Petersen. S.J. 153. |
2021-01-20 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 126. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=SF105 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/SF105.html |