IA SCR4 | 2013-2014 | 85th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-31 - END OF 2013 ACTIONS
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A concurrent resolution relating to the compensation of chaplains, officers, and employees of the eighty-fifth general assembly.
Title
A concurrent resolution relating to the compensation of chaplains, officers, and employees of the eighty-fifth general assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-31 | Senate | END OF 2013 ACTIONS |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 480. |
2013-03-11 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 486. |
2013-03-11 | House | Resolution adopted. H.J. 469. |
2013-03-06 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 433. |
2013-03-05 | House | Subcommittee (committee of the whole), Windschitl, Abdul-Samad, Berry, Fry, Gaskill, Hagenow, Mascher, McCarthy, Muhlbauer, S. Olson, Paulsen, Rogers, J. Smith, M. Smith, and Upmeyer. H.J. 414. |
2013-02-14 | House | Read first time, referred to Administration and Rules. H.J. 290. |
2013-02-14 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 288. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 272. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Resolution adopted. S.J. 270. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 240. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Resolution filed, placed on calendar. S.J. 234. |