IA HSB72 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF306
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 264.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for nurse aide training and testing programs provided by or in a nursing facility.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the requirements for nurse aide training and testing programs provided by or in a nursing facility.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 264. |
2017-02-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/07/2017 8:00AM House Lounge |
2017-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Heaton, Abdul-Samad and Bergan. H.J. 177. |
2017-02-01 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
HF306 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1007.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB72 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB72.html |