IA HSB718 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2522
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the maximum amount of tax credits that may be granted to taxpayers under the endow Iowa tax credit, and effective date and including applicability provisions.(See HF 2522.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the maximum amount of tax credits that may be granted to taxpayers under the endow Iowa tax credit, and effective date and including applicability provisions.(See HF 2522.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-23 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2522. |
2022-02-22 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 347. |
2022-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-17 | House | Subcommittee reassigned: Siegrist, Nordman and Winckler. H.J. 291. |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/17/2022 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Gjerde and Nordman. H.J. 258. |
2022-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 256. |
2022-02-15 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2522 (Replaced by) 2022-02-23 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 353.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB718 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB718.html |