IA HSB706 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2590
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to mobile homes and manufactured homes property taxes, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 2590.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to mobile homes and manufactured homes property taxes, and including applicability provisions.(See HF 2590.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2590. |
2024-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 284. |
2024-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2024 12:00PM RM 304. |
2024-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Kaufmann and Wilburn. H.J. 257. |
2024-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 255. |
2024-02-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2590 (Replaced by) 2024-03-06 - Subcommittee: Thompson, P., Jones and Judge. H.J. 536.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB706 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB706.html |