IA HSB704 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2584
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-21 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 329.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the peace officer and public safety and emergency personnel bill of rights, providing for employee assessments of supervisors of certain state officers, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the peace officer and public safety and emergency personnel bill of rights, providing for employee assessments of supervisors of certain state officers, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-21 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 329. |
2020-02-20 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/20/2020 12:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee: Thorup, Paustian and Thede. |
2020-02-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2584 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Introduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 399.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB704 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB704.html |