IA HSB7 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF123
Note: Legislation replaced by SF132
Note: Legislation replaced by SF132
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-28 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-28 - Voted - Education.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for making a statutory correction to remove an inconsistency regarding the employment of the executive director of the board of educational examiners.
Title
A study bill for making a statutory correction to remove an inconsistency regarding the employment of the executive director of the board of educational examiners.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-28 | House | Voted - Education. |
2015-01-21 | House | 11:30AM; House Lounge Education. |
2015-01-14 | House | Education: Gassman Chair,Brown-Powers, and Salmon. |
2015-01-14 | House | In Education |
2015-01-14 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1055 (Related) 2015-02-02 - Voted - Education.
HF123 (Replaced by) 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 477.
SF132 (Replaced by) 2015-02-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 360.
HF123 (Replaced by) 2015-03-05 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 477.
SF132 (Replaced by) 2015-02-24 - Withdrawn. S.J. 360.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB7 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB7.html |