IA HSB682 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2345
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2480
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2480
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning manufactured homes by creating a manufactured housing program fund and providing eligibility under the home ownership assistance program for military members for the purchase of manufactured homes.
Title
A bill for an act concerning manufactured homes by creating a manufactured housing program fund and providing eligibility under the home ownership assistance program for military members for the purchase of manufactured homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 722. |
2018-03-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-03-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/26/2018 2:00PM House Lounge. |
2018-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: Hinson, Landon and Taylor, T.. |
2018-03-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
SF2345 (Replaced by) 2018-03-14 - Subcommittee: Hinson, Landon and Taylor, T.. H.J. 589.
HF2480 (Replaced by) 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 802.
SSB3019 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2480 (Replaced by) 2018-04-17 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 802.
SSB3019 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB682 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB682.html |