IA HSB673 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2574
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 351.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-24 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 351.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing counties to collect a fee for the issuance and renewal of driver's licenses and nonoperator's identification cards to persons who reside outside the county.
Title
A bill for an act allowing counties to collect a fee for the issuance and renewal of driver's licenses and nonoperator's identification cards to persons who reside outside the county.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-24 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 351. |
2020-02-19 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-18 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/19/2020 11:00AM House Lounge. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Maxwell, Hein and Hunter. H.J. 253. |
2020-02-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2574 (Replaced by) 2020-02-27 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 397.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB673 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB673.html |