IA HSB673 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2478
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 690.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-13 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 690.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act amending the sales tax imposed on certain machinery, equipment, attachments, and replacement parts used in construction.
Title
A bill for an act amending the sales tax imposed on certain machinery, equipment, attachments, and replacement parts used in construction.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. H.J. 690. |
2018-03-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/06/2018 11:00AM House Lounge |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee: Hein, Sieck and Bennett. H.J. 430. |
2018-02-27 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2478 (Replaced by) 2018-05-16 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 997.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB673 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB673.html |