IA HSB671 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2638
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 590.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain tax credits awarded by the economic development authority for equity investments in qualifying businesses or innovation funds and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2638.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain tax credits awarded by the economic development authority for equity investments in qualifying businesses or innovation funds and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2638.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 590. |
2020-03-10 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-03-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/04/2020 12:10PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Mitchell and Brown-Powers. H.J. 253. |
2020-02-11 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2638 (Replaced by) 2020-06-09 - Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. H.J. 668.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB671 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB671.html |