IA HSB671 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2489
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2417
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2417
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 785.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-12 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 785.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to state and local revenue and finance by modifying the income taxes, the sales and use taxes and local option sales tax, the hotel and motel excise tax, the automobile rental excise tax, the Iowa educational savings plan trust, and the disabilities expenses savings plan trust, making penalties applicable, and including immediate effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to state and local revenue and finance by modifying the income taxes, the sales and use taxes and local option sales tax, the hotel and motel excise tax, the automobile rental excise tax, the Iowa educational savings plan trust, and the disabilities expenses savings plan trust, making penalties applicable, and including immediate effective date and retroactive and other applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-12 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 785. |
2018-03-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2018 11:00AM RM 102, Sup. Ct. Consult |
2018-02-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/01/2018 11:00AM House Lounge |
2018-02-15 | House | Subcommittee: Cownie, Windschitl, Pettengill, Prichard and Forbes. H.J. 308. |
2018-02-15 | House | By COMMITTEE ON WAYS AND MEANS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2489 (Replaced by) 2018-05-05 - Withdrawn. H.J. 992.
SF2417 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
SSB3195 (Related) 2018-05-02 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
SF2417 (Replaced by) 2018-05-30 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1088.
SSB3195 (Related) 2018-05-02 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB671 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB671.html |