IA HSB667 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2378
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2461
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2461
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the boards of directors of public corporations, and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the boards of directors of public corporations, and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-14 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2018-02-13 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/14/2018 9:30AM House Lounge |
2018-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Koester, Baltimore and Wolfe. H.J. 262. |
2018-02-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SF2378 (Replaced by) 2018-03-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 751.
HF2461 (Replaced by) 2018-02-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 425.
SSB3183 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF2461 (Replaced by) 2018-02-27 - Withdrawn. H.J. 425.
SSB3183 (Related) 2018-02-14 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB667 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB667.html |