IA HSB659 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: For complete list of accompanied drafts and orders please see the SAST list.
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2582.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for limited liability companies, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2582, HF 2647.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for limited liability companies, providing for fees, and including effective date provisions.(See HF 2582, HF 2647.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2582. |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 283. |
2024-02-12 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/12/2024 12:30PM House Lounge. |
2024-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Dunwell and James. H.J. 205. |
2024-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 202. |
2024-02-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3147 (Related) 2024-02-13 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2347.
SF2347 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Subcommittee: Bousselot, Klimesh, and Quirmbach. S.J. 355.
HF2582 (Replaced by) 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 681.
HF2647 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01.
SF2347 (Replaced by) 2024-02-20 - Subcommittee: Bousselot, Klimesh, and Quirmbach. S.J. 355.
HF2582 (Replaced by) 2024-03-26 - Withdrawn. H.J. 681.
HF2647 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 05/01.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB659 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB659.html |