IA HSB657 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2467
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on April 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-21 - Voted - Ways and Means.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to the income tax checkoffs for the Iowa state fair foundation fund and the veterans trust fund and volunteer fire fighter preparedness fund, and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Title
A study bill relating to the income tax checkoffs for the Iowa state fair foundation fund and the veterans trust fund and volunteer fire fighter preparedness fund, and including retroactive applicability provisions.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-21 | House | Voted - Ways and Means. |
2016-04-20 | House | 8:35AM; House Lounge Ways and Means. |
2016-04-19 | House | Ways and Means: Maxwell Chair,Moore, and Ruff. |
2016-04-19 | House | In Ways and Means |
2016-04-19 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF2467 (Replaced by) 2016-04-25 - Fiscal note. HCS.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB657 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB657.html |