IA HSB652 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2055
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-17 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning the authority of a native wine manufacturer to sell native wine for on-premises consumption.
Title
A bill for an act concerning the authority of a native wine manufacturer to sell native wine for on-premises consumption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-17 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-10 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 4:30PM House Lounge. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee: Bloomingdale, Sexton and Lensing. H.J. 208. |
2020-02-06 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
SF2055 (Replaced by) 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Jochum, and R. Smith. S.J. 138.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB652 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB652.html |