IA HSB635 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the employment of unauthorized aliens and providing penalties.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the employment of unauthorized aliens and providing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2022-02-14 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/15/2022 8:00AM RM 19. |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Wheeler, Kaufmann and Meyer, B. H.J. 161. |
2022-02-01 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 157. |
2022-02-01 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB635 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB635.html |