IA HSB621 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2575
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2575.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-19 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2575.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the nonconsensual causing of death of, or serious injury to, an unborn person, and providing penalties.(See HF 2575.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the nonconsensual causing of death of, or serious injury to, an unborn person, and providing penalties.(See HF 2575.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-19 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2575. |
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 282. |
2024-02-07 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0. |
2024-02-05 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/06/2024 11:30AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Wheeler, Thomson, C. and Wessel-Kroeschell. H.J. 154. |
2024-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 151. |
2024-01-29 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2575 (Replaced by) 2024-03-11 - Subcommittee: Schultz, Bousselot, and Petersen. S.J. 509.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB621 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB621.html |