IA HSB621 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2329
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-16 - Voted - Human Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill for prohibiting certain actions regarding fetal body parts and providing penalties.
Title
A study bill for prohibiting certain actions regarding fetal body parts and providing penalties.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Voted - Human Resources. |
2016-02-15 | House | 1:30PM; House Lounge Human Resources. |
2016-02-11 | House | Human Resources: Fry Chair,Miller, and Wessel-Kroeschell. |
2016-02-11 | House | In Human Resources |
2016-02-11 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
HF2329 (Replaced by) 2016-03-10 - Subcommittee, Bolkcom, Dotzler, and Johnson. S.J. 473.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB621 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB621.html |