IA HSB617 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2397
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2397.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the transport of patients to mental health access centers by an ambulance.(See HF 2397.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the transport of patients to mental health access centers by an ambulance.(See HF 2397.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2397. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 207. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 12:30PM RM 304. |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Meyer, A., Best and Madison. H.J. 143. |
2024-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 143. |
2024-01-25 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
HF2397 (Replaced by) 2024-05-01 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 937.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB617 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB617.html |