IA HSB614 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2137
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2415
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2415
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-12 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to filing requirements applicable to extensions of real estate conveyances or transactions under specified circumstances.
Title
A bill for an act relating to filing requirements applicable to extensions of real estate conveyances or transactions under specified circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-12 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 263. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/05/2020 4:00PM House Lounge. |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Fisher and McConkey. H.J. 173. |
2020-01-30 | House | By COMMITTEE ON COMMERCE |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3004 (Related) 2020-01-31 - Reported out of committee as SF 2137.
SF2137 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
HF2415 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
SF2137 (Replaced by) 2020-03-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 615.
HF2415 (Replaced by) 2020-03-03 - Withdrawn. H.J. 442.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB614 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB614.html |