IA HSB609 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2181
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2391
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2391
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Natural Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-17 - Voted - Natural Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A study bill relating to the funding and operation of programs to collect and dispose of household hazardous materials.
Title
A study bill relating to the funding and operation of programs to collect and dispose of household hazardous materials.
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | House | Voted - Natural Resources. |
2016-02-15 | House | 11:00AM; House Lounge Natural Resources. |
2016-02-10 | House | Natural Resources: Fisher Chair,Bennett, and Maxwell. |
2016-02-10 | House | In Natural Resources |
2016-02-10 | House | Date Recorded |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3045 (Related) 2016-02-11 - Voted - Natural Resources and Environment.
SF2181 (Replaced by) 2016-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 589.
HF2391 (Replaced by) 2016-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 440.
SF2181 (Replaced by) 2016-03-23 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 589.
HF2391 (Replaced by) 2016-03-09 - Withdrawn. H.J. 440.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=HSB609 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/86/Attachments/HSB609.html |