IA HSB608 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2522
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2664
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2664
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-14 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2522.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to procedures to review the exercise of the power of eminent domain.(See HF 2522, HF 2664.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to procedures to review the exercise of the power of eminent domain.(See HF 2522, HF 2664.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-14 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2522. |
2024-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 260. |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/31/2024 8:00AM RM 103, Sup. Ct. Chamber. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee: Thomson, C., Holt and Srinivas. H.J. 133. |
2024-01-24 | House | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 130. |
2024-01-24 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
HF2522 (Replaced by) 2024-03-28 - Withdrawn. H.J. 697.
HF2664 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
HF2664 (Replaced by) 2024-04-10 - Subcommittee recommends passage. [].
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB608 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB608.html |