IA HSB607 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to probation including the length of probation, discharge from probation, payment of fines and fees, and probation violations.
Title
A bill for an act relating to probation including the length of probation, discharge from probation, payment of fines and fees, and probation violations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/02/2022 12:30PM RM 304. |
2022-01-25 | House | Subcommittee: Kerr, Andrews and Olson. H.J. 119. |
2022-01-25 | House | Introduced, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 116. |
2022-01-25 | House | By COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB607 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB607.html |