IA HSB597 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2421
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 278.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the approval procedures for claims for the military service property tax exemption and including applicability provisions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the approval procedures for claims for the military service property tax exemption and including applicability provisions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 278. |
2020-02-11 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2020-02-06 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 11:30AM House Lounge. |
2020-01-29 | House | Subcommittee: Sorensen, Jeanery and Bennett. H.J. 165. |
2020-01-29 | House | By COMMITTEE ON VETERANS AFFAIRS |
Same As/Similar To
HF2421 (Replaced by) 2020-03-10 - Amendment S-5076 filed. S.J. 565.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=HSB597 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/HSB597.html |