IA HSB596 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2390
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2295
Note: Legislation replaced by SF2295
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2390.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-08 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2390.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to certain powers and duties of the department of inspections, appeals, and licensing including confidentiality of information and records, and dependent adult abuse, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2390.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to certain powers and duties of the department of inspections, appeals, and licensing including confidentiality of information and records, and dependent adult abuse, and making penalties applicable.(See HF 2390.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2390. |
2024-02-06 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 207. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2024 2:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Jeneary, Bergan and Turek. H.J. 117. |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to Health and Human Services. H.J. 117. |
2024-01-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Same As/Similar To
SSB3095 (Related) 2024-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 2295.
HF2390 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
SF2295 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 587.
HF2390 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
SF2295 (Replaced by) 2024-03-19 - Withdrawn. S.J. 587.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB596 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB596.html |