IA HSB595 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2326
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2326.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-05 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2326.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to real estate brokers, and the rental or leasing of real estate, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 2326.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to real estate brokers, and the rental or leasing of real estate, and including effective date and applicability provisions.(See HF 2326.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2326. |
2024-01-31 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 175. |
2024-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0. |
2024-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/30/2024 12:00PM RM 19. |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee: Young, Harris and Nielsen. H.J. 117. |
2024-01-22 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 117. |
2024-01-22 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF2326 (Replaced by) 2024-04-19 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 927.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=90&ba=HSB595 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/90/attachments/HSB595.html |