IA HSB583 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2154
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2154.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2154.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to release of certain records maintained by the statewide fire and police retirement system.(See HF 2154.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to release of certain records maintained by the statewide fire and police retirement system.(See HF 2154.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-28 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2154. |
2022-01-27 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 139. |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-01-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 12:00PM RM 304.1. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Siegrist, Bossman and Gjerde. H.J. 98. |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 95. |
2022-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF2154 (Replaced by) 2022-05-02 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 868.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB583 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB583.html |