IA HSB578 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF2497
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-21 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2497.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to gambling regulation and wagering, concerning cashless wagering, forfeiture and withholding of certain gaming winnings, sports wagering, and providing penalties.(See HF 2497.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to gambling regulation and wagering, concerning cashless wagering, forfeiture and withholding of certain gaming winnings, sports wagering, and providing penalties.(See HF 2497.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-21 | House | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 2497. |
2022-02-15 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 287. |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 3-0 |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/03/2022 8:00AM RM 304.1. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee: Lundgren, Cohoon and Sexton. H.J. 98. |
2022-01-19 | House | Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 94. |
2022-01-19 | House | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HF2497 (Replaced by) 2022-06-22 - Fiscal note.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=89&ba=HSB578 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/89/attachments/HSB578.html |